OK SB11 | 2013 | Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - Approved by Governor 09/10/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Volunteer liability; modifying definitions; construing provisions. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Volunteer liability; modifying definitions; construing provisions. Emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-10SenateApproved by Governor 09/10/2013
2013-09-09SenateSent to Governor
2013-09-09HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2013-09-09SenateEnrolled, to House
2013-09-09SenateReferred for enrollment
2013-09-09HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2013-09-09HouseMotion to reconsider tabled
2013-09-09HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 0
2013-09-09HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Wright, Ritze
2013-09-09HouseGeneral Order
2013-09-06HouseSecond Reading, direct to Calendar
2013-09-05HouseFirst Reading
2013-09-05SenateEngrossed to House
2013-09-05SenateReferred for engrossment
2013-09-05SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2013-09-05SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2013-09-04Senatecoauthored by Stiles
2013-09-04Senatecoauthored by Jolley, Shortey
2013-09-04SenateDirect to Calendar
2013-09-04SenateSecond Reading
2013-09-03Senatecoauthored by Shannon (principal House author)
2013-09-03Senatecoauthored by Sykes
2013-09-03SenateAuthored by Senator Bingman
2013-09-03SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback