OK SB1096 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Public buildings; Oklahoma State Facilities Energy Conservation Program. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public buildings; Oklahoma State Facilities Energy Conservation Program. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-08 Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
2012-05-03 Sent to Governor
2012-05-03 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-03 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-02 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-02 Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2012-05-02 HAs adopted
2012-04-30 HAs read
2012-04-30 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-26 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-26 Motion expired
2012-04-24 Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Martin (Scott)
2012-04-24 Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 35; Ayes: 57 Nays: 35
2012-04-24 Amended
2012-04-24 House Rule suspended
2012-04-24 General Order
2012-03-27 CR; Do Pass Energy and Utility Regulation Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation
2012-03-13 First Reading
2012-03-13 Engrossed to House
2012-03-12 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-12 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2012-03-12 General Order, Amended
2012-02-28 coauthored by Martin (Scott) (principal House author)
2012-02-28 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to General Government
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Bingman
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
27A34Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback