OK SB1081 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; state preemption of future red flag laws. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; state preemption of future red flag laws. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-19SenateApproved by Governor 05/19/2020
2020-05-15SenateSent to Governor
2020-05-15HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2020-05-15SenateEnrolled, to House
2020-05-15SenateReferred for enrollment
2020-05-15HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2020-05-15HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 14
2020-05-15HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Grego, Hardin (David), Patzkowsky, Hill, Taylor, Caldwell (Chad), Roberts (Sean), Boles, Lawson, West (Kevin), Smith
2020-05-15HouseGeneral Order
2020-05-14HouseRemove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Steagall
2020-05-06HouseSecond Reading, direct to Calendar
2020-03-16HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-16SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-12SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9
2020-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2020-03-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2020-03-04Senatecoauthored by Roberts (Dustin)
2020-03-02SenateCoauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
2020-02-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Murdock
2020-02-25SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
2020-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2020-02-03SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback