OK SB1072 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue Stabilization Fund; prohibiting and limiting deposits under certain conditions; requiring deposits be reduced under certain conditions. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue Stabilization Fund; prohibiting and limiting deposits under certain conditions; requiring deposits be reduced under certain conditions. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29SenateApproved by Governor 05/29/2019
2019-05-23SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1
2019-05-23HouseJCR adopted
2019-05-23HouseGeneral Order
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
2019-05-21HouseFirst Reading
2019-05-21SenateEngrossed to House
2019-05-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-05-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
2019-05-21SenateJCR adopted
2019-05-20SenateEmergency removed
2019-05-20SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2019-04-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Hilbert
2019-04-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
2019-04-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Rader
2019-04-04SenateAuthored by Senator Thompson
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback