OK SB107 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB107
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Employees Benefits Act; authorizing one-year renewals of certain vision plan contracts. Effective date.
Title
State Employees Benefits Act; authorizing one-year renewals of certain vision plan contracts. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 |
2021-04-13 | House | General Order |
2021-03-29 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2021-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Russ (principal House author) |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Montgomery |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB107 (Carry Over) 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2021