OK SB107 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Precious Metal and Gem Dealer Licensing Act; modifying recordkeeping and regulatory requirements; specifying fines. Effective date.
Title
Precious Metal and Gem Dealer Licensing Act; modifying recordkeeping and regulatory requirements; specifying fines. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/24/2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 6 |
2013-04-17 | House | General Order |
2013-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Armes (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ballenger |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |