OK SB1062 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; creating A Brotherhood Aiming Toward Education of Oklahoma special license plate; creating revolving fund. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; creating A Brotherhood Aiming Toward Education of Oklahoma special license plate; creating revolving fund. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2016-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-03-30 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-02-08 | Senate | coauthored by Hoskin (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paddack |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 1104 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1135 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 288 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |