OK SB1052 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; expanding certain exemptions; providing for licensure by endorsement of certain professionals. Effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; expanding certain exemptions; providing for licensure by endorsement of certain professionals. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-03 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-03 | House | To Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 4 |
2018-05-03 | House | CCR adopted |
2018-05-03 | House | CCR submitted |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-04-24 | Senate | SCs named Griffin, Sykes, Daniels, Dahm, Smalley, Brooks, Floyd |
2018-04-23 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-19 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2018-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 |
2018-04-12 | House | General Order |
2018-03-28 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2018-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |