OK SB1047 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Employment; creating Oklahoma Work Program; providing for training while unemployed. Effective date.
Title
Employment; creating Oklahoma Work Program; providing for training while unemployed. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols |
2014-04-10 | House | Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Wood |
2014-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-02-20 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shortey |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |