OK SB1045 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prisons and reformatories; providing a wage increase to certain personnel classifications within the Oklahoma Department of Corrections. Effective Date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prisons and reformatories; providing a wage increase to certain personnel classifications within the Oklahoma Department of Corrections. Effective Date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateApproved by Governor 05/24/2019
2019-05-21SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-21HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-21SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-21SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-21HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-21HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
2019-05-21HouseJCR adopted
2019-05-21HouseGeneral Order
2019-05-20HouseSecond Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
2019-05-17HouseFirst Reading
2019-05-17SenateEngrossed to House
2019-05-17SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-05-17SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-05-17SenateJCR adopted
2019-05-17Senatecoauthored by Humphrey
2019-05-17SenateCoauthored by Senator Sharp
2019-05-16SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2019-03-25SenateCoauthored by Representative Hilbert
2019-03-25SenateCoauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
2019-03-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Rader
2019-03-25SenateAuthored by Senator Thompson
2019-03-25SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback