OK SB1043 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
County and country officiers; modifying requirements for the assessment of certain fees for dissemination of records; providing an effective date.
Title
County and country officiers; modifying requirements for the assessment of certain fees for dissemination of records; providing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | CCR submitted |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-05-01 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-04-30 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on County and Municipal Government |
2018-04-27 | Senate | SCs named Rosino, Dahm, Bice, Boggs, Murdock, Floyd, Pittman |
2018-04-26 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2018-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 5 |
2018-04-24 | House | General Order |
2018-03-28 | House | Title stricken |
2018-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2018-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rosino |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |