OK SB1017 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Child custody; requiring court to encourage certain parental behaviors in the best interest of the child. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child custody; requiring court to encourage certain parental behaviors in the best interest of the child. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2018-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-08SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-08SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 5
2018-03-08SenateTitle restored
2018-03-08SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2018-02-26SenateCoauthored by Representative Loring (principal House author)
2018-02-20SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-20SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Shaw
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback