OK HR1051 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hochatown; recognizing as an important historical town and present-day tourism destination.
Title
Hochatown; recognizing as an important historical town and present-day tourism destination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
2022-03-29 | House | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2022-03-29 | House | Considered |
2022-03-28 | House | Remove Representative Roberts (Dustin) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Wallace |
2022-03-22 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2022-03-22 | House | Introduced |