OK HR1025 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Professions and Occupations; proclaiming May 6 through May 12, 2019, as Nurses Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and Occupations; proclaiming May 6 through May 12, 2019, as Nurses Week.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseEnrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
2019-05-09HouseAdopted, referred for enrollment
2019-05-09HouseConsidered
2019-05-08HouseAuthored by Representative Stark, Roe
2019-05-08HouseIntroduced

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback