OK HR1014 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR1014
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 76-25)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 76-25)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution proclaiming April 17, 2019, as the 22nd Annual 4-H Day at the Capitol.
Title
A Resolution proclaiming April 17, 2019, as the 22nd Annual 4-H Day at the Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
2019-04-17 | House | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2019-04-17 | House | Coauthored by all other Representatives |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered |
2019-04-15 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2019-04-15 | House | Introduced |
Same As/Similar To
HR1014 (Carry Over) 2019-04-18 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State