OK HR1006 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR1006
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the importance and relevance of members of the real estate industry; recognizing Real Estate Day at the Capitol on March 6, 2019.
Title
Recognizing the importance and relevance of members of the real estate industry; recognizing Real Estate Day at the Capitol on March 6, 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
2019-03-06 | House | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2019-03-06 | House | Considered |
2019-03-04 | House | Authored by Representative Vancuren |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduced |
Same As/Similar To
HR1006 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State