OK HJR1121 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

A Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the Oklahoma Uniform Building Code Commission; distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the Oklahoma Uniform Building Code Commission; distribution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-07 Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight
2012-05-25 Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
2012-05-25 Sent to Governor
2012-05-25 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2012-05-25 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2012-05-24 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-24 Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
2012-05-24 Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9
2012-05-24 General Order, Considered
2012-05-17 Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2012-05-07 Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2012-05-02 First Reading
2012-05-02 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-05-01 Referred for engrossment
2012-05-01 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 1
2012-05-01 General Order
2012-04-25 Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author)
2012-04-25 CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee
2012-04-17 Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight
2012-04-16 Authored by Representative Jordan
2012-04-16 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback