OK HJR1108 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Failed in Committee - Agriculture and Rural Development
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Failed in Committee - Agriculture and Rural Development
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the Oklahoma Department of Agriculture, Food, and Forestry; distribution.
Title
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the Oklahoma Department of Agriculture, Food, and Forestry; distribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | Failed in Committee - Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2012-04-17 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2012-04-11 | First Reading | |
2012-04-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 17 | |
2012-04-10 | General Order | |
2012-04-04 | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) | |
2012-04-04 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight | |
2012-03-28 | Authored by Representative Richardson | |
2012-03-28 | First Reading |