OK HJR1095 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Vetoed 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Vetoed 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Disapproving permanent rule of the State Board of Health; distribution.
Title
Disapproving permanent rule of the State Board of Health; distribution.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Ron Peters [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Vetoed 06/08/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-24 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-24 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2012-05-24 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-05-24 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-05-22 | General Order, considered and deferred | |
2012-05-15 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2012-04-17 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2012-03-29 | First Reading | |
2012-03-29 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-28 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-28 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 | |
2012-03-28 | General Order | |
2012-03-26 | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-26 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee | |
2012-02-20 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight | |
2012-02-16 | Authored by Representative Peters | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading |