OK HJR1050 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed in Committee - Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Constitution; revenue-raising measures; modifying voting requirement by legislature; ballot title; filing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Constitution; revenue-raising measures; modifying voting requirement by legislature; ballot title; filing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 45 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFailed in Committee - Rules
2018-03-21SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2018-03-19Senatecoauthored by Yen
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-19HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-15HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-15HouseMotion expired
2018-03-15HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Fetgatter
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 41
2018-03-15HouseAyes: 45 Nays: 41
2018-03-15HouseAmendment tabled
2018-03-15HouseAuthored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2018-03-15HouseGeneral Order
2018-03-05HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Wright
2018-03-05HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Fetgatter
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback