OK HJR1022 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Approving and disapproving certain proposed permanent rules of state agencies; distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Approving and disapproving certain proposed permanent rules of state agencies; distribution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 53 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 46 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-23HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-23SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-23HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-23HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-23HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 37
2019-05-23HouseAyes: 19 Nays: 63
2019-05-23HouseMotion to divide question failed
2019-05-23HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-05-22HouseSA's received
2019-05-22SenateEngrossed to House
2019-05-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-05-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
2019-05-22SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-05-20SenateDirect to Calendar
2019-05-17SenateFirst Reading
2019-05-17HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-05-16HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-05-16HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 21
2019-05-16HouseAmended
2019-05-16HouseAuthored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
2019-05-16HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader
2019-05-16HouseGeneral Order
2019-05-01HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee
2019-04-23HouseSecond Reading referred to Administrative Rules
2019-04-18HouseAuthored by Representative Gann
2019-04-18HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hjr1022&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hres/HJR1022%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HJR1022%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HJR1022%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hres/HJR1022%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HJR1022%20SAHJR%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hres/HJR1022%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HJR1022_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HJR1022_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback