OK HJR1022 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - coauthored by Faught
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - coauthored by Faught
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; limiting term of office of certain elected officials.
Title
Constitutional amendment; limiting term of office of certain elected officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-06 | coauthored by Faught | |
2009-04-06 | Title stricken | |
2009-04-06 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed | |
2009-04-02 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-24 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Faught | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-03-12 | First Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 30 | |
2009-03-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Reynolds | |
2009-03-11 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | Authored by Senator Brogdon (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Murphey | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
ART 6 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
ART 6 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |