OK HJR1016 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-14 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-14 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Foreign trade zones; Cimarron County; revocation of status; emergency.
Title
Foreign trade zones; Cimarron County; revocation of status; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-02-23 | First Reading | |
2011-02-23 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-02-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-22 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | |
2011-02-22 | General Order | |
2011-02-17 | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-17 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Blackwell | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |