OK HJR1002 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Constitution; ad valorem taxation; valuation increases; ballot title; filing.
Title
Oklahoma Constitution; ad valorem taxation; valuation increases; ballot title; filing.
Sponsors
Sen. Cliff Branan [R] | Rep. David Dank [R] | Rep. Elise Hall [R] | Sen. David Holt [R] |
Rep. Charles Joyner [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Randy McDaniel [R] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] |
Rep. Mike Reynolds [R] | Rep. Mike Reynolds [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Michael Schwartz [R] |
Rep. Mike Shelton [D] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2011-04-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-21 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 16 | |
2011-04-20 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hall, Nelson, Schwartz, McDaniel (Randy), Joyner | |
2011-04-20 | SA's read, adopted | |
2011-04-14 | SA's received | |
2011-04-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 19 | |
2011-04-13 | Title restored | |
2011-04-13 | coauthored by Branan | |
2011-04-13 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-06 | coauthored by Treat | |
2011-04-06 | coauthored by Shelton | |
2011-04-06 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-06 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-17 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-16 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 16 | |
2011-03-16 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Holt | |
2011-03-16 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Reynolds, Ritze, Kern | |
2011-03-16 | General Order | |
2011-02-24 | Authored by Senator Reynolds (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-24 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Dank | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |