OK HCR1053 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Proclaiming Mitochondrial Disease Awareness Week.
Title
Proclaiming Mitochondrial Disease Awareness Week.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2010-04-21 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-21 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-20 | Adopted, returned to House | |
2010-04-20 | coauthored by all other Senators | |
2010-04-20 | Considered | |
2010-04-20 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-04-14 | First Reading | |
2010-04-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Adopted, referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-13 | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) | |
2010-04-13 | Coauthored by all other Representatives | |
2010-04-13 | Considered | |
2010-03-04 | Authored by Representative Wright (Harold) | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced |