OK HCR1038 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 70-32)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 70-32)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Designating May 6-12, 2012, as Nurses Week; distribution.
Title
Designating May 6-12, 2012, as Nurses Week; distribution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2012-05-15 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-15 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-14 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-14 | Adopted, returned to House | |
2012-05-14 | Considered | |
2012-05-14 | Direct to Calendar | |
2012-05-09 | First Reading | |
2012-05-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-08 | Adopted, referred for engrossment | |
2012-05-08 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2012-05-08 | Coauthored by all other Representatives | |
2012-05-08 | Considered | |
2012-04-24 | Authored by Representative Fourkiller | |
2012-04-24 | Introduced |