OK HCR1012 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Agriculture; recognizing the right to engage in certain farming and ranching practices.
Title
Agriculture; recognizing the right to engage in certain farming and ranching practices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | House | Filed with Secretary of State |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Considered |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2013-05-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-05-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-07 | House | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered |
2013-04-10 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2013-04-10 | House | Authored by Representative Biggs |
2013-04-10 | House | Introduced |