OK HCR1001 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-19 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-19 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Electoral College system; supporting the current Electoral College system.
Title
Electoral College system; supporting the current Electoral College system.
Sponsors
Sen. Clifford Aldridge [R] | Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Rep. David Dank [R] | Rep. David Derby [R] |
Rep. John Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-18 - House - House: (Y: 55 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | First Reading | |
2009-03-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-18 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-18 | Ayes: 55 Nays: 35 | |
2009-03-18 | Adopted | |
2009-03-18 | Authored by Senator Aldridge (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-18 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dank, Wright (John), Derby | |
2009-03-18 | Considered | |
2009-02-05 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Withdrawn from Calendar; referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Banz | |
2009-02-02 | Introduced |