OK HB9999 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-20 - Authored by Representative Brown
Pending: House Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee

Summary

Test. Please disregard.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Test. Please disregard.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-12-01 - House - House: (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-20 Authored by Representative Brown
2012-07-10 Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment
2012-07-02 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback