OK HB4390 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers; Education Leadership Oklahoma Act; modifying micro-credential program for teachers; effective date.
Title
Teachers; Education Leadership Oklahoma Act; modifying micro-credential program for teachers; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Waldron |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2022-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 |
2022-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller |
2022-03-09 | House | General Order |
2022-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Baker |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |