OK HB4160 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Line item vetoed 05/20/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Department of Corrections; authorizing certain lease payments; authorizing expenditure of certain funds for certain purposes; budgeted funds requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Corrections; authorizing certain lease payments; authorizing expenditure of certain funds for certain purposes; budgeted funds requirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseLine item vetoed 05/20/2020
2020-05-14HouseSent to Governor
2020-05-14SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-14HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2020-05-14HouseReferred for enrollment
2020-05-14SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
2020-05-14SenateJCR adopted
2020-05-13SenateDirect to Calendar
2020-05-12SenateFirst Reading
2020-05-12HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-05-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-05-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0
2020-05-12HouseJCR adopted
2020-05-12HouseGeneral Order
2020-05-11HouseJCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2020-05-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2020-04-06HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Rader
2020-04-06HouseAuthored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
2020-04-06HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace, Hilbert
2020-04-06HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback