OK HB4148 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Civil procedure; medical debts; civil actions; default judgments; procedures; effective date.
Title
Civil procedure; medical debts; civil actions; default judgments; procedures; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Schreiber [D] | Sen. Julie Daniels [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Rep. Daniel Pae [R] |
Rep. Amanda Swope [D] | Rep. Ellyn Hefner [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Swope |
2024-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner |
2024-03-05 | House | General Order |
2024-02-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae |
2024-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Schreiber, Lepak |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |