OK HB4143 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency services; creating the Emergency Management Assistance Compact and Rescue Out of State Deployments Revolving Fund; effective date.
Title
Emergency services; creating the Emergency Management Assistance Compact and Rescue Out of State Deployments Revolving Fund; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/03/2022 |
2022-04-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-28 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2022-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1 |
2022-03-23 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative May |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |