OK HB4098 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Dentists and dental hygienists; Compact; commission membership; license; oversight; effective date.
Title
Dentists and dental hygienists; Compact; commission membership; license; oversight; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerrid Kendrix [R] | Sen. Todd Gollihare [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] |
Rep. Josh West [R] | Rep. Trey Caldwell [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 |
2024-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, West (Josh), McBride |
2024-03-11 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Trey) |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2024-02-26 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | Remove Representative Caldwell (Trey) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kendrix |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |