OK HB4085 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; creating Rural Jobs Act; tax credit; investment; ownership; reporting; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; creating Rural Jobs Act; tax credit; investment; ownership; reporting; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Sen. Brent Howard [R] | Rep. Eddy Dempsey [R] | Rep. Dick Lowe [R] |
Sen. Darcy Jech [R] | Sen. Julia Kirt [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 67 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: ADVANCE (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: ADVANCE (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Approved by Governor 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2022-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2022-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 6 |
2022-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2022-05-19 | House | Title restored |
2022-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2022-05-04 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2022-04-28 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kirt |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jech |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Dick) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dempsey |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-09 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |