OK HB4049 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; registration; online renewal; requiring certain fees be deposited in General Revenue Fund; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; registration; online renewal; requiring certain fees be deposited in General Revenue Fund; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-22 - House - House: VETO OVERRIDE WITHOUT EMER (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2004-01-01 - Senate - Senate: Veto Override (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseFiled with Secretary of State
2020-05-22SenateMeasure returned to House
2020-05-22SenateVeto overridden: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
2020-05-22HouseTo Senate
2020-05-22HouseVeto overridden: Ayes: 89 Nays: 7
2020-05-22HouseVetoed 05/19/2020
2020-05-13HouseSent to Governor
2020-05-13SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-13HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2020-05-12HouseReferred for enrollment
2020-05-12SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2020-05-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2020-05-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Scott
2020-05-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Boggs
2020-05-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2020-05-11SenateDirect to Calendar
2020-05-11SenateWithdrawn from Finance committee
2020-04-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2020-03-16SenateCoauthored by Representative Manger
2020-03-16SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-16HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2020-03-11HouseAmended
2020-03-11HouseAuthored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
2020-03-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hill, Randleman
2020-03-11HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Kerbs
2020-02-11HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback