OK HB4041 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health; risk exposure; virus and disease; requiring release of certain records and information to funeral directors and embalmers; effective date.
Title
Public health; risk exposure; virus and disease; requiring release of certain records and information to funeral directors and embalmers; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Approved by Governor 05/07/2020 |
2020-05-04 | House | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-04 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-04 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 8 |
2020-05-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |