OK HB3995 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fire suppression; portable fire extinguishers; mobile food establishments; annual inspection; emergency.
Title
Fire suppression; portable fire extinguishers; mobile food establishments; annual inspection; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Approved by Governor 04/23/2024 |
2024-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 2 |
2024-03-06 | House | General Order |
2024-02-14 | House | Emergency added |
2024-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |