OK HB3972 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-30 - 2 CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-30 - 2 CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
State government; defining terms; authorizing certain assignment of claims to the Attorney General; scope of authority; limitations; public interest standard; emergency.
Title
State government; defining terms; authorizing certain assignment of claims to the Attorney General; scope of authority; limitations; public interest standard; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Roger Thompson [R] | Rep. Tammy Townley [R] | Rep. Josh Cantrell [R] |
Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Tourism & Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Tourism & Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Senate | 2 CCR read |
2024-05-30 | House | To Senate |
2024-05-30 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2024-05-30 | House | 2 CCR adopted |
2024-05-29 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard |
2024-05-29 | House | Remove Senator Bullard as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Thompson (Roger) |
2024-05-29 | House | 2 CCR submitted |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Further conference granted, same conferees |
2024-05-29 | House | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees |
2024-05-28 | House | Title restored |
2024-05-28 | House | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Alonso-Sandoval, Hefner, Pittman |
2024-05-28 | House | Remove Senator Thompson (Roger) as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Bullard |
2024-05-28 | House | CCR submitted |
2024-05-20 | House | HC's named: GCCA |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Thompson (Roger), Bullard, Pederson, Garvin, Gollihare, Dossett |
2024-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2024-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pittman |
2024-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 2 |
2024-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner, Cantrell, Townley |
2024-03-04 | House | General Order |
2024-02-15 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |