OK HB3955 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Roe
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Roe
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Childbirth and mental health; definitions; grants to private organizations for services; State Department of Health; methods; reimbursable services; State Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; effective date; emergency.
Title
Childbirth and mental health; definitions; grants to private organizations for services; State Department of Health; methods; reimbursable services; State Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roe |
2024-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Blancett |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |