OK HB3950 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Health; Alzheimer's Dementia and Other Forms of Dementia Special Care Disclosure Act; adding type of care; penalties; misdemeanor; effective date.
Title
Health; Alzheimer's Dementia and Other Forms of Dementia Special Care Disclosure Act; adding type of care; penalties; misdemeanor; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller |
2024-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Blancett |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |