OK HB3905 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages; excise tax; remittance; license holders; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; excise tax; remittance; license holders; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2020-03-09Senatecoauthored by Davis
2020-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative McDugle
2020-03-04SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-03HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-03HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2020-03-03HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-20HouseAuthored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author)
2020-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2020-02-13HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget
2020-02-11HouseWithdrawn from Business and Commerce Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Fetgatter
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback