OK HB3752 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; making certain acts unlawful; providing penalties; forfeiture of property; emergency.
Title
Crimes and punishments; making certain acts unlawful; providing penalties; forfeiture of property; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | CCR read |
2022-05-17 | House | To Senate |
2022-05-17 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 7 |
2022-05-17 | House | CCR adopted |
2022-05-16 | House | Title restored |
2022-05-16 | House | CCR submitted |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Leewright, Paxton, Taylor, Rosino, Dossett (J.J.) |
2022-05-03 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2022-04-28 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 11 |
2022-03-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Emergency added |
2022-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |