OK HB3747 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Soldiers and sailors; Oklahoma Veterans Commission; Commission powers and duties; State Veterans Homes; Oklahoma Department of Veterans Affairs; private nursing facilities; effective date.
Title
Soldiers and sailors; Oklahoma Veterans Commission; Commission powers and duties; State Veterans Homes; Oklahoma Department of Veterans Affairs; private nursing facilities; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Grego [R] | Sen. Warren Hamilton [R] | Rep. Robert Manger [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] |
Rep. Max Wolfley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 10 |
2024-03-05 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Hamilton (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger, Wolfley, Smith |
2024-03-05 | House | General Order |
2024-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Grego |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |