OK HB3613 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Officers; creating the Personal Privacy Protection Act; prohibiting public agencies from disclosing certain personal affiliation information; effective date.
Title
Officers; creating the Personal Privacy Protection Act; prohibiting public agencies from disclosing certain personal affiliation information; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] |
Rep. Jay Steagall [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Approved by Governor 05/19/2020 |
2020-05-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-12 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2020-05-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from General Government committee |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2020-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 13 |
2020-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak, Moore |
2020-03-05 | House | General Order |
2020-02-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Steagall |
2020-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Efficiency Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative ODonnell |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |