OK HB3531 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Counties and county officers; recodifying statutes relating to free district fairs; effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; recodifying statutes relating to free district fairs; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2020-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-02 | House | General Order |
2020-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Kerbs |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |