OK HB3470 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Counties and county officers; directing deposit of funds from certain contracts into Sheriff's Service Fee Account; effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; directing deposit of funds from certain contracts into Sheriff's Service Fee Account; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 04/24/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 7 |
2018-03-15 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-15 | House | General Order |
2018-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John) |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Jordan |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |