OK HB3429 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages; authorizing holders of multiple small brewer licenses to sell beer at multiple locations; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; authorizing holders of multiple small brewer licenses to sell beer at multiple locations; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McEntire
2020-02-26HouseRemove Representative McEntire as principal House author and substitute with Representative Strom
2020-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
2020-02-25HouseReferred to Business and Commerce
2020-02-25HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative McEntire
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback