OK HB3418 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; income tax; full expensing; requiring conformity with Internal Revenue Code; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; income tax; full expensing; requiring conformity with Internal Revenue Code; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Approved by Governor 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2022-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2022-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2022-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading rescinded |
2022-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 0 |
2022-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2022-05-19 | House | Title restored |
2022-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2022-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2022-04-20 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 12 |
2022-03-10 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |