OK HB3394 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; modifying term limit of Oklahoma Commission on Children and Youth membership. Effective date.
Title
Children; modifying term limit of Oklahoma Commission on Children and Youth membership. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - House - House: (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-05 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-07 | SA's received | |
2010-04-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-06 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-04-06 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-22 | First Reading | |
2010-02-22 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-18 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-18 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 4 | |
2010-02-18 | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-18 | General Order | |
2010-02-10 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Human Services | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Kirby | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |